The Minifig Co., LLC v. Citizen Brick, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE MINIFIG CO., LLC
Defendant: CITIZEN BRICK, LLC, JOSEPH A TRUPIA and Joseph A. Trupia
Case Number: 6:2019cv01054
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal, #2 Complaint) (RDO)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by The Minifig Co., LLC. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/1/2019. (MMW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by The Minifig Co., LLC (Davis, Amber)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RDO)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1054-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizen Brick, LLC and Joseph A. Trupia, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15550043), filed by The Minifig Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Davis, Amber) Modified on 6/10/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Minifig Co., LLC v. Citizen Brick, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MINIFIG CO., LLC
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Represented By: Kevin W. Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZEN BRICK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH A TRUPIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Trupia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?