Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. v. Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SYNERGY SETTLEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: ZipLiens, LLC, Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC and William Nathan Parkey
Case Number: 6:2019cv01071
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 34 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-1071-Orl-78GJK. Judge Carlos E. Mendoza no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Notice/Motion of Withdraw of Attorney from Case. Attorney Richard V. Blystone terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/5/2019. (HMK)
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 CASE REFERRED to Mediation (Mediator: A. Michelle Jernigan). (DMA)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2019, Discovery due by 6/30/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2020, Pretrial statement due by 12/14/2020, All other motions due by 11/2/2020, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2020, Trial Status Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, Bench Trial set for the trial term commencing 1/4/2021 in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/25/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/2/2019. (DJD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Salzman, Gary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Richard V. Blystone to withdraw as attorney by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Salzman, Gary) Modified on 7/24/2019 (DMA).
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of filing Affidavit of Jason D. Lazarus re #26 Response to motion by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Salzman, Gary) Modified on 7/22/2019 (DMA).
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of filing Affidavit of Anthony F. Prieto, Jr. re #26 Response to motion by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Salzman, Gary) Modified on 7/22/2019 (DMA).
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc.. (Salzman, Gary)
June 27, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Plaintiff shall file its response as to #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim on or before July 22, 2019. (DMA)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve its Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to dismiss on or before July 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/27/2019. (HMK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc.. (Kepner, Christina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Synergy Settlements Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Synergy Settlement Services Consulting, LLC for Synergy Settlement Services, Inc... (Salzman, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Weiss on behalf of Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Weiss, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/24/2019 (DMA).
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Kepner on behalf of Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Kepner, Christina) Modified on 6/24/2019 (DMA).
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Gary S. Salzman on behalf of Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Salzman, Gary) Modified on 6/24/2019 (DMA).
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Salzman, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Kepner on behalf of Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Kepner, Christina)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary S. Salzman on behalf of Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. (Salzman, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by William Nathan Parkey identifying Other Affiliate William Nathan Parkey for William Nathan Parkey.. (Leigh, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by ZipLiens, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Matthew McGill, Other Affiliate William Nathan Parkey, Other Affiliate Christopher Derry, Other Affiliate Shane Hall, Other Affiliate Andrew Wilson for ZipLiens, LLC.. (Leigh, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC identifying Other Affiliate William Nathan Parkey, Other Affiliate Christopher Derry for Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC.. (Leigh, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases Defendants' Notice of No Pending Related Cases re #9 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC, William Nathan Parkey, ZipLiens, LLC. Related case(s): No (Leigh, Michael) Modified on 6/21/2019 (DMA).
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William Nathan Parkey)(Leigh, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2019 (DMA).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of service by Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC, William Nathan Parkey, ZipLiens, LLC re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice . (Ott, London)
June 14, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael T. Leigh, appearing on behalf of Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC, William Nathan Parkey, ZipLiens, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL083388.) Related document: #5 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Michael T. Leigh to appear pro hac vice. (AC)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/13/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/27/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 6/13/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Notice/Motion of Withdrawal of Attorney from Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/12/2019. (HMK)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/12/2019. (HMK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE/MOTION for Richard V. Blystone to withdraw as attorney by Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. Originally filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 04/24/2019. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Michael T. Leigh to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(DeVault, Megan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 6/12/2019 (BIA).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/11/2019. (HMK)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1071-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Michael T. Leigh to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification/Special Admission Form)(DeVault, Megan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Ninth Judicial Circuit, in and for Orange Court, FL, case number 2019-CA-004096-O filed in State Court on 04/02/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15561253 filed by William Nathan Parkey, ZipLiens, LLC, Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeVault, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergy Settlement Services, Inc. v. Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYNERGY SETTLEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Christina Marie Kepner
Represented By: Richard V. Blystone
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Weiss
Represented By: Gary S. Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZipLiens, LLC
Represented By: Megan Costa DeVault
Represented By: Michael T. Leigh
Represented By: London Lee Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panoptic Insurance Group, LLC
Represented By: Megan Costa DeVault
Represented By: Michael T. Leigh
Represented By: London Lee Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Nathan Parkey
Represented By: Megan Costa DeVault
Represented By: Michael T. Leigh
Represented By: London Lee Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?