Lundy v. Ophthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: David W Glasser and Antoinette Lundy
Defendant: Ophthalmic Partners of Florida and Opthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01174
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 7/25/19 by Antoinette Lundy as to Opthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.. (RDO)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Opthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.. (RDO)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Antoinette Lundy. (Glasser, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 7/9/19 by Antoinette Lundy as to Opthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.. (RDO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Antoinette Lundy. Related case(s): yes (Glasser, David) Modified on 7/9/2019 (RDO).
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Antoinette Lundy. (Glasser, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ophthalmic Partners of Florida with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Glasser, David)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/2/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/2/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Ophthalmic Partners of Florida. (RDO)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/27/2019. (MDH)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1174-Orl-40LRH. Motion(s) REFERRED: #3 First MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (SJB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antoinette Lundy. (Glasser, David) Modified on 6/26/2019 (RDO).
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 US Marshal 285 form (Glasser, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ophthalmic Partners of Florida with Jury Demand filed by Antoinette Lundy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glasser, David) Modified on 6/26/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Ophthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ophthalmic Partners of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opthalmic Partners of Florida, P.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Glasser
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Lundy
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?