Massey et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael D. Massey and Janet E. Massey
Defendant: The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Norcold, Inc. and Thetford Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01181
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #22 Interested persons order by Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (Plankey, Scott)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 RENEWED UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/8/2019. (HMK)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Natalie Mousseau to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing by 8/21/19. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendants by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for to appear pro hac vice by Janet E. Massey, Michael D. Massey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF TERRENCE A. BEARD, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Kaye, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 26, 2019. All Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/6/2019. (HMK)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to counsel Natalie Mousseau of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed).
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 **Per counsel duplicate motion filed** See #16. Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Plankey, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified on 8/6/2019 (DMA).
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott William Plankey on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation (Plankey, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Plankey, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott William Plankey on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation (Plankey, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2019 by Michael D. Massey, Janet E. Massey as to Norcold, Inc.. (Kaye, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2019 by Michael D. Massey, Janet E. Massey as to The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. (Kaye, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2019 by Michael D. Massey, Janet E. Massey as to Thetford Corporation. (Kaye, Joseph)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/15/2019. (HMK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Janet E. Massey, Michael D. Massey. (Kaye, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2019 (DMA).
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Janet E. Massey, Michael D. Massey. Related case(s): yes (Kaye, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2019 (DMA).
July 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Terrance A. Beard, appearing on behalf of Janet E. Massey, Michael D. Massey (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057170.) Related document: #8 MOTION for TERRENCE A. BEARD to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for TERRENCE A. BEARD to appear pro hac vice by Janet E. Massey, Michael D. Massey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Terrence A. Beard, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaye, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/11/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 6/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Terrence A. Beard, Esq. of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Adam M. Moskowitz, Esq. of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed).
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (DMA)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1181-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15623606) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons NORCOLD, INC., #9 Proposed Summons THETFORD CORPORATION, #10 Proposed Summons THE DYSON-KISSNER-MORAN CORPORATION)(Kaye, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Mousseau
Represented By: Dale R. Hightower
Represented By: Scott William Plankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcold, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Mousseau
Represented By: Dale R. Hightower
Represented By: Scott William Plankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thetford Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Mousseau
Represented By: Dale R. Hightower
Represented By: Scott William Plankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Massey
Represented By: Joseph Kaye
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Represented By: Terrence A. Beard
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet E. Massey
Represented By: Joseph Kaye
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Represented By: Terrence A. Beard
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?