Dick Baird, Inc v. Reed Motors Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dick Baird, Inc
Defendant: APR Motors Inc., APR Automotive, Inc. and Reed Motors Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01192
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-1192-Orl-78LRH. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Dick Baird, Inc. (Semanie, Michael) Modified on 7/26/2019 (BIA).
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Spickard, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #12 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/16/19. (MT)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/16/2019. (MDH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/15/19. (MT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Dick Baird, Inc. (Semanie, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dick Baird, Inc. Related case(s): no (Semanie, Michael) Modified on 7/16/2019 (BIA).
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in support re #3 Motion to dismiss, #1 Notice of Removal filed by APR Automotive, Inc., APR Motors Inc., Reed Motors Inc.. (Spickard, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by APR Automotive, Inc., APR Motors Inc., Reed Motors Inc.. (Spickard, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by APR Automotive, Inc., APR Motors Inc., Reed Motors Inc.. (Spickard, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by APR Automotive, Inc., APR Motors Inc., Reed Motors Inc.. Related case(s): No (Spickard, Robert) Modified on 7/15/2019 (BIA).
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/1/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by APR Automotive, Inc., APR Motors Inc., Reed Motors Inc. **Originally filed in Seminole County Circuit Court on 06/18/2019. (BIA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1192-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-CA-001623 filed in State Court on 5/21/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15631910 filed by APR Automotive, Inc., APR Motors, Inc., Reed Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT with summonses, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forehand, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dick Baird, Inc v. Reed Motors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APR Motors Inc.
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APR Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Motors Inc.
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dick Baird, Inc
Represented By: Michael Semanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?