Phillips v. Wawa, Inc.
Plaintiff: Devin Phillips
Defendant: Wawa, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01208
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Siegel, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference. Provided the parties agree to the essentials of the Case Management Report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/21/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically For Case Management Conference by Wawa, Inc.. (Siegel, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Devin Phillips. (Glasser, David)
August 13, 2019 Set deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Responses due by 8/19/2019 (SPM)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 First Motion to Extend Time to August 19, 2019, to Respond Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/13/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to extend time to August 19, 2019, to Respond Motion to Dismiss by Devin Phillips. (Glasser, David) Modified on 8/13/2019 (SPM).
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Wawa, Inc.. (Fischler, Ilanit)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wawa, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Siegel, Steven)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Wawa, Inc.. (Siegel, Steven)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 7/10/2019 by Devin Phillips as to Wawa, Inc. (SPM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Wawa, Inc. (SPM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Devin Phillips. (Glasser, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Devin Phillips. (Glasser, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Devin Phillips. Related case(s): yes (Glasser, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Devin Phillips. (Glasser, David) Modified on 7/3/2019 (SPM).**USM 285 Form missing Attorney signature. Attorney contacted.**
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/3/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/17/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 7/3/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff's counsel shall obtain the required forms on the Court's website, and return the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the Clerk on or before July 17, 2019. The Clerk is directed to provide the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s) to the United States Marshal. Upon receipt of the completed summons(es) and Marshal 285 form(s), the United States Marshal is directed to serve the summonses without cost to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/2/2019. (RN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1208-Orl-41DCI. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 First MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (SJB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Devin Phillips. (Glasser, David) Modified on 7/2/2019 (SPM).
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glasser, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Wawa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Phillips
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawa, Inc.
Represented By: Ilanit Sisso Fischler
Represented By: Steven A. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?