Pump It Up Holdings, LLC et al v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Pump It Up Holdings, LLC and FB Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Fun Enterprises Inc., Barbara Catalano, Robert Anderson, Nancy Catalano and RJA, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01252
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 46 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RJA, LLC (RDO)
September 3, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #42 Motion to dismiss filed by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against RJA, LLC by Pump It Up Holdings, LLC, FB Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel)(Baker, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 27, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #41 Interested persons order by Robert Anderson. (RDO)
August 21, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss #20 Amended Complaint by Robert Anderson and RJA, LLC. (RDO)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to DEFENDANTS ROBERT ANDERSON, BARBARA CATALANO, NANCY CATALANO and FUN ENTERPRISES INC. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/19/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Barbara Catalano, Nancy Catalano, Fun Enterprises Inc..(Gonzalez, Tino)
August 13, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED MOTION for preliminary injunction by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Baker, Amy) Text modified on 8/14/2019 (RDO).
August 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC of Filing Verification of #20 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/14/2019 (RDO).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due to filing of Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/7/2019. (ED)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/6/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED Summons Returned Executed as to RJA, LLC on 7/13/19 by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/7/2019 (RDO).
August 6, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED Summons Returned Executed as to Robert Anderson on 7/13/19 by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/7/2019 (RDO).
August 6, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED Summons Returned Executed as to Fun Enterprises, Inc. on 7/29/19 by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/7/2019 (RDO).
August 5, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response as to #1 Complaint by Robert Anderson. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS returned executed on 8/1/19 as to Nancy Catalano by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/6/2019 (RDO).
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS returned executed on 8/1/19 as to Barbara Catalano by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/6/2019 (RDO).
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS returned executed on 8/1/19 as to Barbara Catalano by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/6/2019 (RDO).
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(RDO)
August 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Marie Boomershine on behalf of FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC (Boomershine, Stephanie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Anderson, Barbara Catalano, Nancy Catalano, Fun Enterprises Inc., RJA, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Pump It Up Holdings, LLC, FB Holdings, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Pump It Up Holdings, LLC, FB Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/1/2019 (BIA).
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/1/2019 (BIA).
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 07/29/19 by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC as to Fun Enterprises Inc. (Baker, Amy) Modified on 8/1/2019 (BIA).
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Outlier Holdings LLC for FB Holdings, LLC.. (Baker, Amy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #11 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Baker, Amy) Modified on 7/25/2019 (BIA).
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 07/13/2019 by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC as to RJA, LLC (Baker, Amy) Modified on 7/25/2019 (BIA).
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 07/13/2019 by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC as to Robert Anderson (Baker, Amy) Modified on 7/25/2019 (BIA).
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for preliminary injunction by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Baker, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Corbin, #3 Affidavit Santoni Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Baker, Amy)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/11/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/11/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BIA)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Robert Anderson, Barbara Catalano, Nancy Catalano, Fun Enterprises Inc., RJA, LLC. (BIA)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC. (Baker, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by FB Holdings, LLC, Pump It Up Holdings, LLC (Baker, Amy) Modified on 7/10/2019 (BIA).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1252-Orl-31DCI. (SJB)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15666783) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registered Marks, #2 Exhibit Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit Infringement, #4 Exhibit Infringement, #5 Exhibit Infringement, #6 Exhibit Infringement, #7 Exhibit Infringement, #8 Exhibit Infringement, #9 Exhibit Infringement, #10 Exhibit Infringement, #11 Exhibit Infringement)(Baker, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pump It Up Holdings, LLC et al v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fun Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Tino Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Catalano
Represented By: Tino Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Catalano
Represented By: Tino Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pump It Up Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Represented By: Stephanie Marie Boomershine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FB Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Represented By: Stephanie Marie Boomershine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?