John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Rayfield et al
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Defendant: WILLIAM ROBERT RAYFIELD, III, JAMES ANDREW RAYFIELD, American Funeral Financial, LLC, RANDY ALLEN RAYFIELD and SHARON RAYFIELD
Case Number: 6:2019cv01270
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 8/20/2019 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) as to Sharon Rayfield (reissued summons) (Massing, Steffie) Modified on 9/6/2019 (SPM).
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER of service returned executed on August 19, 2019 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) as to William Robert Rayfield, III. (Massing, Steffie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER of service returned executed on August 19, 2019 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) as to Randy Allen Rayfield. (Massing, Steffie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER of service returned executed on August 19, 2019 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) as to James Andrew Rayfield. (Massing, Steffie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED summons to be issued by American Funeral Financial, LLC. (Ross, Warren)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED summons to be issued by American Funeral Financial, LLC. (Ross, Warren)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED summons to be issued by American Funeral Financial, LLC. (Ross, Warren)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED summons to be issued by American Funeral Financial, LLC. (Ross, Warren)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.), James Andrew Rayfield, Randy Allen Rayfield, Sharon Rayfield, William Robert Rayfield, III by American Funeral Financial, LLC.(Ross, Warren)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS reissued as to Sharon Rayfield. (SPM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing SUMMONS returned unexecuted by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) as to Sharon Rayfield. re #5 Summons issued (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Summons to Sharon Rayfield, #2 Exhibit B-Summons Issued to Sharon Rayfield on July 12, 2019)(Massing, Steffie) Modified on 8/14/2019 (SPM).
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Funeral Financial, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Security National Financial Corporation for American Funeral Financial, LLC.. (Ross, Warren) Modified on 8/9/2019 (SPM).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant American Funeral Financial, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. American Funeral Financial, LLC shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/7/2019. (JLE)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant American Funeral by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/6/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by American Funeral Financial, LLC. (Ross, Warren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 8/5/2019 (SPM).
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Massing, Steffie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Interested persons order by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). Related case(s): NO (Buhite, Russell) Modified on 7/26/2019 (SPM).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Buhite, Russell) Modified on 7/26/2019 (SPM).
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1270-ORL-41-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to American Funeral Financial, LLC, James Andrew Rayfield, Randy Allen Rayfield, Sharon Rayfield, William Robert Rayfield, III. (SPM)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/12/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/26/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 7/12/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1270-Orl-41TBS. (SJB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Interpleader Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15674615) filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Massing, Steffie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Rayfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ROBERT RAYFIELD, III
Represented By: Martin David Schwebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ANDREW RAYFIELD
Represented By: Martin David Schwebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Funeral Financial, LLC
Represented By: Warren Russell Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY ALLEN RAYFIELD
Represented By: Martin David Schwebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON RAYFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: Steffie Kathleen Massing
Represented By: Russell Scott Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?