Aly v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tarek Aly
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01280
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Embry J Kidd
3 Judge: Thomas B Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Baldwin, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Joint Motion to Be Excused from the In-Person Meeting Requirement of the Court's Related Case Order and Track Two Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/20/2019. (JLE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to be excused from the in-person meeting requirement of the court's related case order and track two-notice by Tarek Aly. (Baldwin, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lexington Insurance Company.(Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 8/9/2019 (BIA).
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-1280-Orl-78EJK. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 3, 2019 Filing 20 Remark: Doc. #19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/2/19. (ESG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Lexington Insurance Company (Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 8/2/2019 (BIA).
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lexington Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Dornstein, Scott)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/26/19. (MT)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Unopposed Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant, Lexington Insurance Company, shall have through and including August 8, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/26/2019. (RML)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Lexington Insurance Company. (Dornstein, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 7/26/2019 (BIA).
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1280-ORL-37-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Tarek Aly identifying Other Affiliate AIG Claims, Inc., Other Affiliate Vincent Campasano, Other Affiliate Ramflas Roofing Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Bismarck Campo for Tarek Aly.. (Baldwin, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tarek Aly. Related case(s): no (Baldwin, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lee Baldwin on behalf of Tarek Aly (Baldwin, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Lexington Insurance Company answer or response due 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/16/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lexington Insurance Company. (Dornstein, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. Modified on 7/17/2019 (BIA).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lexington Insurance Company. (Dornstein, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/12/2019. (Smith, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal by Lexington Insurance Company. Originally filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 07/03/2019. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1280-Orl-37TBS. (SJB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate disclosure statement - Rule 7.1 Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US Inc, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Company.. (Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 7/15/2019 (BIA).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-007049-O filed in State Court on 06-10-2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15678842 filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Pending Motion, #8 Exhibit 8 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 7/12/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aly v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarek Aly
Represented By: Louis Anthony Gonzalez
Represented By: Beatriz Benitez
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Dornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?