Keystone Tile, Inc. et al v. MileStone and Paver, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bay Stone & Tile, LLC and Keystone Tile, Inc.
Defendant: MileStone and Paver, LLC and TravertinePavers.com, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01285
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Interested persons order by MileStone and Paver, LLC, TravertinePavers.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Milestone Tampa LLC, Other Affiliate MileStone and Paver, LLC, Other Affiliate Serdar Sokelen, Other Affiliate Gulsah Sokelen for MileStone and Paver, LLC, TravertinePavers.com, Inc. (Varkonyi, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc. by TravertinePavers.com, Inc., MileStone and Paver, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Specimen from SNOW WHITE trademark application, #2 Exhibit Wikipedia article and Merriam Webster definition on snow white color, #3 Exhibit Google(TM) search of third parties using snow white to describe color, #4 Exhibit Travertinepavers.com Moscow white tile page, #5 Exhibit Specimen from COLORADO trademark application, #6 Exhibit Baystone COLORADO webpage, #7 Exhibit SNOW WHITE trademark application)(Varkonyi, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 8/21/2019, Defendants shall respond to the Complaint. However, the Motion continues to fail to comply with Local Rule 1.05(a) because it is not double spaced. The parties are cautioned that further filings made in violation of Local Rule 1.05(a) will be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/6/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Zagrebelsky, Alla) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 8/7/2019 (AC).
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of compliance re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice, #9 Notice of pendency of related cases by Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc. (Shannin, Nicholas)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to Defendants. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/6/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Further, the Motion fails to comply with Local Rule 1.05(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/6/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Zagrebelsky, Alla) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 8/6/2019 (AC).
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Varkonyi on behalf of MileStone and Paver, LLC, TravertinePavers.com, Inc. (Zagrebelsky, Alla) Modified on 8/6/2019 (AC). Modified on 8/7/2019 (AC).
July 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Keith Jaasma, appearing on behalf of Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084429.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Keith Jaasma to appear pro hac vice. (JP)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc.. (Shannin, Nicholas)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/23/2019. (RN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Keith Jaasma to appear pro hac vice by Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shannin, Nicholas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc. Related case(s): No (Shannin, Nicholas) Modified on 7/24/2019 (LMM).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/15/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/15/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to MileStone and Paver, LLC, TravertinePavers.com, Inc. (LMM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LMM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc.. (Shannin, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bay Stone & Tile, LLC, Keystone Tile, Inc.. (Shannin, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1285-Orl-31DCI. (SJB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MileStone and Paver, LLC, TravertinePavers.com, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15682111) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shannin, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keystone Tile, Inc. et al v. MileStone and Paver, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Stone & Tile, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A. Shannin
Represented By: Keith Duane Jaasma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone Tile, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Shannin
Represented By: Keith Duane Jaasma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MileStone and Paver, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Varkonyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TravertinePavers.com, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Varkonyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?