Coleman v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 6:2019cv01303
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Russell Coleman. U.S Attorney served on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 (Girley, Jerry) Modified on 8/14/2019 (DMA).
August 11, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/19. (ESG)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Order to strike by Russell Coleman. (Girley, Jerry) Modified on 8/9/2019 (AC).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to strike re: #8 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Russell Coleman Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/7/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 (STRICKEN per #9)-CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Russell Coleman. (Girley, Jerry) Modified on 8/9/2019 (AC).
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Russell Coleman. Related case(s): No (Girley, Jerry) Modified on 8/7/2019 (JP).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Secretary of Veterans Affairs and U.S. Attorney . (DMA) Modified on 8/2/2019 (RDO).
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Russell Coleman. (Girley, Jerry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Russell Coleman. (Girley, Jerry)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/26/2019. (ctp) (JLC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/26/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Secretary of Veterans Affairs with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-84071 filed by Russell Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman
Represented By: Jerry Girley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?