Nichia Corporation v. Lighting Science Group Corporation
Plaintiff: Nichia Corporation
Defendant: Lighting Science Group Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01333
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/13/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Plaintiff's National Lead Counsel to Attend Case Management Conference Telephonically and Memorandum of Law In Support by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 9/13/2019 (SPM).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Joint Motion to Consolidate Case Management Conference Dates. The case management conference may be conducted September 23, 2019 in conjunction with the conference in 6:19-cv-1332 and 6:19-cv-1334. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/30/2019. (Dalton, Jr., Roy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Set Date for CMC Consistent with Dates In Related Cases And Memorandum of Law In Support by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/27/2019. (RMN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Brown, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE To Counsel: Counsel is to submit the attached Patent Case Management Report following the completion of the Case Management Conference (ctp) (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #21 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 13, 2019 Filing 24 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:19-cv-01333-Orl-37EJK. Judge Wendy W. Berger no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It is ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Honorable Roy B. Dalton, Jr., with his consent, for consideration with related case 6:19-cv-1332-ORL-37EJK. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/12/2019. (RMF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lighting Science Group Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USP8530250, #2 Exhibit B - USP8309375, #3 Exhibit C - USP8728916)(Johnson, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Rawls; granting #14 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert P. Parker; granting #15 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. McCallum; granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael H. Jones; and granting #17 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenny Colgate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/6/2019. (JLE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nichia Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Related Cases)(Yost, Eleanor)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-1333-Orl-78EJK. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Jenny Colgate to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Michael H. Jones to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel R. McCallum to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Robert P. Parker to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Mark Rawls to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mark Rawls, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084480.) (AC)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael H. Jones, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORl084479.) (AC)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Robert P. Parker, Jenny Colgate, Daniel McCallum, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084477.) (AC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Johnson on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Johnson, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1333-ORL-40-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 07/23/2019 by Nichia Corporation as to Lighting Science Group Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/23/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Lighting Science Group Corporation. (AC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits-Part I, #2 Complaint with Exhibits-Part II) (AC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel (Robert Parker, Jenny Colgate, Michael Jones, Daniel McCallum, and Mark Rawls) of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (AC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-1333-Orl-40TBS. (SJB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE-Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Modified on 7/22/2019 (AC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nichia Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15710342) filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Yost, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichia Corporation v. Lighting Science Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichia Corporation
Represented By: Eleanor Martha Yost
Represented By: William G. Giltinan
Represented By: Mark T. Rawls
Represented By: Robert P. Parker
Represented By: Daniel R. McCallum
Represented By: Michael H. Jones
Represented By: Jenny L. Colgate
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: John Coy Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Science Group Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?