Nichia Corporation v. Vividgro, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nichia Corporation
Defendant: Vividgro, Inc. and Lighting Science Group Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01334
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/13/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically and Memorandum of Law In Support by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 9/16/2019 (BIA).
August 27, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Answer due by 9/30/2019. (BIA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/27/2019. (RMN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Brown, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1334-Orl-37EJK. Judge Paul G. Byron, Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER transferring case to Magistrate Judge Embry Kidd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/15/2019. (MDH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #16 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER transferring case to the Honorable Roy B. Dalton, Jr., with his consent, for consideration with related case 6:19-cv-1332-Orl-37EJK. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/12/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lighting Science Group Corporation, Vividgro, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USP9865773, #2 Exhibit B - USP8728916, #3 Exhibit C - USP8120057)(Johnson, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nichia Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Other Related Cases)(Yost, Eleanor)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/6/2019. (MDH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Mark Rawls to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Robert P. Parker to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel R. McCallum to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Michael H. Jones to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Yost, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Jenny Colgate to appear pro hac vice by Nichia Corporation. (Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mark Rawls, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084480.) (AC)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael H. Jones, appearing on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084479.) (AC)
August 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jenny Colgate, Robert P. Parker, Daniel McCallum, appearing on behalf of (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL084475. (AC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Johnson on behalf of Nichia Corporation (Johnson, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/29/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/29/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 7/23/19 as to Defendant Lighting Science Group Corp. by Nichia Corporation (Yost, Eleanor) Modified on 7/26/2019 (RDO).
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 7/23/19 as to Defendant Vividgro, Inc. by Nichia Corporation (Yost, Eleanor) Modified on 7/26/2019 (RDO).
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RDO)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint) (RDO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1334-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Nichia Corporation Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Yost, Eleanor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nichia Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15710460) filed by Nichia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Vividgro, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Lighting Science Group Corporation)(Yost, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichia Corporation v. Vividgro, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichia Corporation
Represented By: Eleanor Martha Yost
Represented By: William G. Giltinan
Represented By: Mark T. Rawls
Represented By: Robert P. Parker
Represented By: Daniel R. McCallum
Represented By: Michael H. Jones
Represented By: Jenny L. Colgate
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: John Coy Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vividgro, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighting Science Group Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Reuben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?