Jackson v. Inch et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Marshall Jackson
Defendant: G.L. Woodard, J. Baldridge and Mark Inch
Case Number: 6:2019cv01369
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief ; denying #15 Motion for Reconsideration.. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/20/2019. (SC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE to the court of the appeal filing fee by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(JP)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of inquiry by Douglas Marshall Jackson re #1 Complaint (copy of docket sheet mailed).(DMA)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Rehearing re #3 Order dismissing case by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #16 Notice of appeal. (JP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT re #10 Motion for temporary restraining order/ Motion for Preliminary Injunction. by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Douglas Marshall Jackson. Filing fee not paid. (JP)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Rehearing/ MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on Motion for Hearing by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Petition to Compel Irreparable Injury Injunctive Relief by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE filing evidence and exhibits in support re #10 MOTION for temporary restraining order, MOTION for preliminary injunction by Douglas Marshall Jackson (DMA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing fee payment by Douglas Marshall Jackson (DMA)
September 6, 2019 PLRA FEES paid by Douglas Marshall Jackson (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number ORL085330) (RCN)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Service of Process; denying #10 Motion for temporary restraining order; denying #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Case was dismissed on 8/7/19. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/30/2019.(copy mailed to plaintiff) (AKC)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for temporary restraining order, MOTION for preliminary injunction by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Order to direct rule 4 process of service of the summons and complaint upon the defendants by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing fee processing by Douglas Marshall Jackson (DMA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Douglas Marshall Jackson. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(RDO)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Enjoin State's Daily 70-Counts of Substantial Burden and Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/15/2019. (SC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of payment of filing fee by Douglas Marshall Jackson (DMA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically petition to enjoin the state's daily 70-counts of substantial burden, MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (DMA)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/7/2019. (SC)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 7/29/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Baldridge, Mark Inch, G.L. Woodard filed by Douglas Marshall Jackson. (No fee payment and no IFP Motion submitted with Complaint)(AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Inch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Marshall Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.L. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?