Nwobi v. Azar
Plaintiff: Dr. Obinna Uchenna Nwobi and Obinna Uchenna Nwobi
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 6:2019cv01404
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION re #11 Order on Motion to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Indest, George)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/20/2019. (JLE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Obinna Uchenna Nwobi. (Indest, George)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #6 Related case order by Obinna Uchenna Nwobi. Related case(s): no (Indest, George) Modified on 8/14/2019 (SPM).
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of service by Obinna Uchenna Nwobi re #5 MOTION for leave to file under seal pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552a, 42 U.S.C. 11137(b), 45 C.F.R. 60 , #7 Interested persons order, #6 Related case order and track 2 notice, #4 Summons issued as to USA, #1 Complaint and envelope containing confidential exhibits. (Indest, George)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/6/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/20/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 8/6/2019. (DJD) ctp
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to file under seal pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552a, 42 U.S.C. 11137(b), 45 C.F.R. 60.20, 395.0193(7) & (8), 766.101(5), 766.1016(2), and 766.205(4), Fla. Stat. by Obinna Uchenna Nwobi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NPDB Reports Time)(Indest, George) Modified on 8/1/2019 (SPM).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. (SPM)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1404-Orl-41EJK. (SJB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Obinna Uchenna Nwobi. (Indest, George)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Challenge Agency Policy, for Review of Final Agency Actions, Violations of the Privacy Act of 1974, Damages, Declaratory Judgment, and Injunctive Relief, Temporary and Permanent against Alex M. Azar, II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15746655) filed by Obinna Uchenna Nwobi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit Adverse Report submitted to and maintained by NPDB, #4 Exhibit Final Agency Action by DHHS dated January 29, 2018, #5 Exhibit Final Agency Action by DHHS dated March 28, 2019, #6 Exhibit U.S. DHHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, NPDB Guidebook (Rockville, Mary, April 2015) (excerpts))(Indest, George) Modified on 7/31/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nwobi v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Obinna Uchenna Nwobi
Represented By: George F. Indest, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obinna Uchenna Nwobi
Represented By: George F. Indest, III
Represented By: Carole Carter Schriefer
Represented By: Lance O'Neal Leider
Represented By: Achal Anand Aggarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?