Falcon Medical Group, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Plaintiff: Falcon Medical Group, Inc.
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Case Number: 6:2019cv01417
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Paul G Byron
2 Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Keller, Courtney)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Falcon Medical Group, Inc.. (Hoepker, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #12 Related case order by Falcon Medical Group, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Hoepker, Todd) Modified on 9/13/2019 (SPM).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/10/2019. (RMF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Regina M. Fermer/Deputy Clerk on 9/10/2019. (RMF) Modified on 9/11/2019 (RMF).
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., a publicly traded company (symbol: JPM) for JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.. (Keller, Courtney)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Related case(s): y (Keller, Courtney)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Hoepker on behalf of Falcon Medical Group, Inc. (Hoepker, Todd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.(Keller, Courtney)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:19-cv-1417-Orl-78LRH. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to File a Response to the Complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA answer or response due 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/2/2019. (MKH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE-Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Keller, Courtney)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel August J. Stanton III of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (AC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1417-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time of Defendant to 8/21/19 to File a Response to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 8/2/2019 (AC).
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Civil, case number 2019-CA-008353-O filed in State Court on 07-08-19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15755036 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcon Medical Group, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Courtney M. Keller
Represented By: Tyrone Andre Adras
Represented By: Colin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falcon Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: August J. Stanton, III
Represented By: Todd M. Hoepker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?