Tom v. City of Indian Harbour Beach et al
Plaintiff: David Tom
Defendant: City of Indian Harbour Beach and Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01432
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wilson, Louis)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, For a More Definitive Statement, With Supporting Memorandum of Law, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Tom. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SPM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 Remark: Doc. #19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/23/19. (EJV)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Wilson, Louis)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc.. (Wilson, Louis)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, For a More Definitive Statement, With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc.. (Wilson, Louis)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Indian Harbour Beach. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rego Chapman, Patricia)
August 29, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Answer due by 9/13/2019. (BIA)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 9/13/2019, Defendants shall respond to the Complaint. No further extensions should be sought absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/29/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Tom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BIA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Maria Rego Chapman on behalf of City of Indian Harbour Beach (Rego Chapman, Patricia)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Indian Harbour Beach, Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noah, Douglas) Modified on 8/29/2019 (BIA).
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/26/19. (MT)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of service re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by David Tom. (BIA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by David Tom. (BIA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David Tom. Related case(s): yes (BIA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 08/08/2019 by David Tom as to Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc. (BIA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 08/08/2019 by David Tom as to City of Indian Harbour Beach. (BIA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Return of Service re #2 Summons issued by David Tom (BIA)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/12/2019. (JLC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/12/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/12/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400- receipt number ORL084481. Filed by David Tom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom v. City of Indian Harbour Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Indian Harbour Beach
Represented By: Patricia Maria Rego Chapman
Represented By: Douglas T. Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbour Beach Volunteer Fire Department, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Donlan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?