U.S. Bank, National Association v. Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Lina M. Olarte-Levine, Sandy Lane Reserve Homeowners Association, Inc., Lina Levine, Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida and PNC Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01434
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Jonathan Meisels to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/10/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order Amended by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER striking #9 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by U.S. Bank, National Association. Plaintiff is directed to re-file the Certificate of Interested Persons and include the required certification, "I hereby certify that, except as disclosed above, I am unaware of any actual or potential conflict of interest involving the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to this case, and will immediately notify the Court in writing on learning of any such conflict." Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/30/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Lina M. Olarte-Levine. (MAA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lina M. Olarte-Levine. Related case(s): yes.(MAA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by U.S. Bank, National Association (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa) Modified on 8/23/2019 (RDO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by U.S. Bank, National Association. Related case(s): Yes (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa) Modified on 8/22/2019 (RDO).
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 (STRICKEN BY #14 ENDORSED ORDER) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa) Modified on 9/4/2019 (RDO).
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to remand to State Court by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Sloat-Rogers, Vanessa)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #2 Defendant Lavine's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/13/2019. (JLE)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
August 8, 2019 FILING FEES paid by Lina M. Olarte-Levine (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ORL084656) (JP)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Jonathan Ian Meisels of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Lina M. Olarte-Levine (originally filed in State Court on 7/22/19). (RDO) Modified on 8/5/2019 (RDO).
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-002063 filed in State Court on 7/1/19. filed by Lina M. Olarte-Levine. (filing fee not paid) (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions -Motion to Extend Time to file a Response to the Complaint, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) Modified on 8/5/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina M. Olarte-Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Lane Reserve Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jonathan I. Meisels
Represented By: Vanessa D. Sloat-Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?