Taveras v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Eliezer Taveras
Defendant: Christiana Trust, Servis One Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Fay Servicing, LLC and Meridian Asset Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01469
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Servis One Inc.. (Silver, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 3, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #27 Order to show cause filed by Servis One Inc.. (Silver, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order, #27 Order to show cause by Servis One Inc.. (Silver, Jason)
October 2, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Responses due by 10/10/2019 (BIA)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #34 Defendants Christiana Trust, Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB and Fay Servicing, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The motion fails to include a memorandum of law that addresses excusable neglect under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/2/2019. (RMN)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant Meridian Asset Services, Inc.'s #22 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his response on or before October 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/2/2019. (RMN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Eliezer Taveras. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 1, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC. (Diaz, Adam)
October 1, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC. Related case(s): YES (Diaz, Adam)
October 1, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC. (Diaz, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Diaz on behalf of Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC (Diaz, Adam)
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason David Silver on behalf of Servis One Inc. (Silver, Jason)
September 24, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of pendency of related cases (re: #15 Order) per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America, N.A.. Related case(s): Yes (Warman, Samuel) Modified on 9/26/2019 (MAA).
September 24, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Warman, Samuel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum in Support by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Warman, Samuel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/20/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Defendant Servis One Inc. Defendant has failed to comply with the Court's Order #15. Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/20/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed (GNB).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #25 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Bank of America, N.A. has failed to satisfy the excusable neglect standard of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6 regarding the requested extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/19/2019. (RMN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kemp-Gerstel on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #15 Interested persons order by Meridian Asset Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Mortgage Consultants, Inc., Corporate Parent SitusAMC Group Holdings, LP, Other Affiliate STONE POINT CAPITAL LLC for Meridian Asset Services, Inc... (Carreja, Tirso)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Meridian Asset Services, Inc.. (Carreja, Tirso) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 5, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on 08/19/2019 by Eliezer Taveras as to Bank of America, N.A. (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF of service as to Servis One Inc. by Eliezer Taveras (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF of service as to Fay Servicing, LLC by Eliezer Taveras (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed by Eliezer Taveras as to Meridian Asset Services, Inc. (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 08/14/2019 by Eliezer Taveras as to Fay Servicing, LLC. (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 08/14/2019 by Eliezer Taveras as to Servis One Inc. (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants Servis One Inc. and Meridian Asset Services, Inc. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/5/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Meridian Asset Services, Inc. shall have until and through 9/18/2019 to file its response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/31/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
August 30, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Answer due by 10/4/2019. (BIA)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Meridian Asset Services, Inc.. (Carreja, Tirso) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tirso M. Carreja, Jr on behalf of Meridian Asset Services, Inc. (Carreja, Tirso)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have until and through October 4, 2019, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/30/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Servis One Inc.. (Taub, Roy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to Clerk by Eliezer Taveras. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service-Fay Servicing, LLC, #2 Return of Service-Meridian Asset Services, LLC)(AC)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2019. (GNB) copies mailed
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to E-File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/12/2019. (RMN)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to E-File by Eliezer Taveras. (AC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Eliezer Taveras. (AC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eliezer Taveras. Related case(s): Yes. (AC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC, Meridian Asset Services, Inc., Servis One Inc. (AC)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Christiana Trust, Fay Servicing, LLC, Meridian Asset Services, Inc., Servis One Inc. with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ORL084678 filed by Eliezer Taveras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit V-1, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taveras v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Adam Alexander Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One Inc.
Represented By: Jason David Silver
Represented By: Roy Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew Kemp-Gerstel
Represented By: Samuel Jason Warman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam Alexander Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Asset Services, Inc.
Represented By: S. Elizabeth King
Represented By: Tirso M. Carreja, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?