Legrand v. Reed Group Management LLC
Plaintiff: MARY LEGRAND
Defendant: REED GROUP MANAGEMENT LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01478
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/3/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Plaintiff/Defendant to Hold Case Management Conference Telephonically by Reed Group Management LLC. (Leon, Jose)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/27/19. (MT)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Reed Group Management LLC identifying Other Affiliate The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Reed Acquisitions LLC, Other Affiliate Guardian Investor Services LLC for Reed Group Management LLC.. (Leon, Jose)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Reed Group Management LLC. Related case(s): No (Leon, Jose) Modified on 8/27/2019 (BIA).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #3 Order to Show Cause in light of #10 Defendant's Response. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/21/2019. (PKK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #3 Order to show cause by Reed Group Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Leon, Jose)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Reed Group Management LLC.(Leon, Jose) Modified on 8/19/2019 (BIA).
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/16/19. (ESG)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Mary Legrand. (Mihok, Melissa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mary Legrand. Related case(s): no (Mihok, Melissa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/14/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/14/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to show cause why its claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(2) should not be dismissed or disregarded due to deficient citizenship allegations as to Reed Group Management LLC. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/12/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1478-Orl-37EJK. (SJB)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-007163-O filed in State Court on June 11, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15788640 filed by Reed Group Management LLC . (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Leon, Jose) Modified on 8/13/2019 (BIA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legrand v. Reed Group Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY LEGRAND
Represented By: Melissa Christine Mihok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REED GROUP MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Jose Ignacio Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?