Jackson et al v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Smith, Jean Noel, Warren Jackson and Kyron Frazier
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01499
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Simpson, Amanda)
October 7, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 10/14/2019 (RDO)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to extend time. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/7/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Joint Case Management Report by Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Lambert, Joanne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc..(Simpson, Amanda)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 8/15/2019 by Kyron Frazier, Jean Noel, Warren Jackson, Jacquelyn Smith as to UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Botros, Paul)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 8/28/2019 by Kyron Frazier, Jean Noel, Warren Jackson, Jacquelyn Smith as to Optum Services, Inc.. (Botros, Paul)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Optum, Inc., Other Affiliate United Healthcare Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Connextions, Inc. for Optum Services, Inc.; Other Affiliate United Healthcare Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Connextions, Inc., Other Affiliate Optum, Inc. for UnitedHealth Group, Inc... (Simpson, Amanda)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants UnitedHealth Group, Inc. and Optum Services, Inc. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/5/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Madonna Michelle Snowden on behalf of Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Snowden, Madonna)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Simpson on behalf of Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Simpson, Amanda)
August 30, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: Answer due by 9/30/2019. (BIA)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have until and through September 30, 2019, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/30/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint by Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Lambert, Joanne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kyron Frazier, Warren Jackson, Jean Noel, Jacquelyn Smith. Related case(s): No. (Botros, Paul) Modified on 8/27/2019 (AC).
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kyron Frazier, Warren Jackson, Jean Noel, Jacquelyn Smith. (Botros, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (AC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1499-Orl-40EJK. (SJB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15799223) filed by Kyron Frazier, Jean Noel, Warren Jackson, Jacquelyn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons UnitedHealth Group Inc, #4 Proposed Summons Optum Services Inc.)(Botros, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Smith
Represented By: Paul M. Botros
Represented By: Anthony J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Noel
Represented By: Paul M. Botros
Represented By: Anthony J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Jackson
Represented By: Paul M. Botros
Represented By: Anthony J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyron Frazier
Represented By: Paul M. Botros
Represented By: Anthony J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joanne Braddock Lambert
Represented By: Amanda A. Simpson
Represented By: Madonna Michelle Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joanne Braddock Lambert
Represented By: Amanda A. Simpson
Represented By: Madonna Michelle Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?