Nation v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lynn Nation
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01537
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-06281, filed on 10/07/2019. (SJW)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (MAA)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 9/17/2019 by Ronnie Lynn Nation as to Monsanto Company (Petosa, Frank) Modified on 9/18/2019 (DMA).
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number MDL-2741, In re: Roundup Product Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 9/16/2019, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Complaint) (MAA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ronnie Lynn Nation. Related case(s): yes (Petosa, Frank)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Ronnie Lynn Nation. (Petosa, Frank)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/10/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 8/27/2019. (DJD) ctp
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (DMA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1537-Orl-41DCI. (NAS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15818989) filed by Ronnie Lynn Nation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Petosa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nation v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lynn Nation
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?