Bryant v. Youssef et al
Plaintiff: Leonard P. Bryant
Defendant: Nagi Youssef, North Oak Health Group, LLC, Bassem Girgis and North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01539
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 RETURN of service executed on 9/20/19 by Leonard P. Bryant as to Bassem Girgis. (Wolff, Frank)
October 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Defendants. (Lieser, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Lieser on behalf of Bassem Girgis, North Oak Health Group, LLC, North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc., Nagi Youssef (Lieser, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 9/20/19 by Leonard P. Bryant as to North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc.. (Wolff, Frank)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on 9/20/19 by Leonard P. Bryant as to North Oak Health Group, LLC. (Wolff, Frank)
October 3, 2019 Set/reset deadlines: The deadline for Defendant Nagi Youssef to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint (Doc. No. 8) is extended up to and including October 14, 2019. (DMA)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer or Response to Amended Complaint #8 due on or before 10/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/3/2019. (MKH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to Complaint by Nagi Youssef. (Coleman, Laura)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/2/2019. (MDH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Lauren A. Warner to appear pro hac vice by Leonard P. Bryant. (Wolff, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel and Electronic Mail Address Designation Appearance by Laura Mauldin Coleman on behalf of Nagi Youssef (Coleman, Laura)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 09/11/19 by Leonard P. Bryant as to Nagi Youssef. (Wolff, Frank)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #15 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/11/2019. (MKH)
September 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Lauren A. Warner, appearing on behalf of Leonard P. Bryant (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL085462.) Related document: #15 MOTION for Lauren A. Warner to appear pro hac vice. (RCN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Lauren A. Warner to appear pro hac vice by Leonard P. Bryant. (Wolff, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/6/19. (EJV)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Leonard P. Bryant. (Wolff, Frank)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Leonard P. Bryant. Related case(s): No (Wolff, Frank) Modified on 9/6/2019 (DMA).
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to North Oak Health Group, LLC. (JP)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS reissued as to Bassem Girgis, North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc., Nagi Youssef per amended complaint. (JP)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Leonard P. Bryant. (Wolff, Frank)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bassem Girgis, North Oak Health Group, LLC, North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc., Nagi Youssef filed by Leonard P. Bryant. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Leonard P. Bryant.(Wolff, Frank)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/22/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/22/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
August 21, 2019 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 8/27/2019. (JP)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. On or before, Tuesday, August 27, 2019, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to adequately replead by this deadline may result in closure of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/21/2019. (PKK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Lauren A. Warner of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bassem Girgis, Nagi Youssef, North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc.. (DMA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1539-Orl-37LRH. (NAS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15819407) filed by Leonard P Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - M, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons for each Defendant)(Wolff, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Youssef et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagi Youssef
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Lieser
Represented By: Laura Mauldin Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Oak Health Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Lieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bassem Girgis
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Lieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Oak Regional Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Lieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard P. Bryant
Represented By: Frank Martin Wolff
Represented By: Lauren A. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?