Sirbu v. Attorney General, etc., et al
Plaintiff: Igor Sirbu
Defendant: William Barr, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), Kimberly Dean, Field Office Director, USCIS Orlando Field Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service, Acting Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 6:2019cv01775
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Igor Sirbu. Attorney General of the United States served on 9/19/2019. (Gihon, John) Modified on 10/2/2019 (SPM).
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Igor Sirbu. Acting Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/24/2019; Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/24/2019; Field Office Director, USCIS Orlando Field Office served on 9/24/2019; United States Citizenship and Immigration Service served on 9/24/2019. (Gihon, John) Modified on 10/2/2019 (SPM).
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Acting Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, USCIS Orlando Field Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MAA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Igor Sirbu. (Gihon, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (ctp) (JLC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1775-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-15908005) filed by Igor Sirbu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Gihon, John) Modified on 9/11/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sirbu v. Attorney General, etc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, USCIS Orlando Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Sirbu
Represented By: John Gihon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?