United State of America, etc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tilt Up Plus, LLC and United States of America
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01784
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Federal Insurance Company. (Hamilton, Austin)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Federal Insurance Company shall file a Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/11/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Federal Insurance Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company.(Birr, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (Washington, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by United States of America identifying Corporate Parent Tilt Up Plus, LLC for United States of America.. (Washington, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/13/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/13/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (MAA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1784-Orl-78DCI. (SJB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15914512) filed by Tilt Up Plus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Taylor, Timothy) Modified on 9/13/2019 (MAA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United State of America, etc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: James O. Birr, III
Represented By: Austin T. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilt Up Plus, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Shane Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy Shane Taylor
Represented By: Robert Paul Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?