Wagner v. Alfie's Restaurant Inc.
Plaintiff: Tavia Wagner
Defendant: Alfie's Restaurant Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01790
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfie's Restaurant Inc..(Schonsheck, Bethany)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Alfie's Restaurant Inc.. (Schonsheck, Bethany)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alfie's Restaurant Inc.. Related case(s): no (Schonsheck, Bethany)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Lyn Schonsheck on behalf of Alfie's Restaurant Inc. (Schonsheck, Bethany)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #6 Order Setting Hearing by Tavia Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Cases List)(Quick, Joe)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2019 by Tavia Wagner as to Alfie's Restaurant Inc.. (Quick, Joe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Tavia Wagner. (Quick, Joe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tavia Wagner. Related case(s): n (Quick, Joe)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADA Scheduling Order. Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/18/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/18/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADA RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/18/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Alfie's Restaurant Inc. (SPB)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1790-Orl-78LRH. (SJB)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alfie's Restaurant Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15920979) filed by Tavia Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Alfie's Restaurant Inc.)(Quick, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Alfie's Restaurant Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfie's Restaurant Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Lyn Schonsheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavia Wagner
Represented By: Joe Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?