Voice Control Vehicles, LLC v. Esprit Model, Inc.
Plaintiff: Voice Control Vehicles, LLC
Defendant: Esprit Model, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01816
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Voice Control Vehicles, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Moore, Suzette)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/25/19. (EJV)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order, #9 Order to strike by Voice Control Vehicles, LLC. (Moore, Suzette) Modified on 9/25/2019 (BIA).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to strike re: #2 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Voice Control Vehicles, LLC Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/24/2019. (Ctp)(JLC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of compliance re #2 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #7 Interested persons order by Voice Control Vehicles, LLC (Moore, Suzette)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/23/2019. (ctp)(JLC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/23/2019. (Ctp)(JLC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS) (MAA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Esprit Model, Inc. (MAA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-1816-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #9** CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Voice Control Vehicles, LLC. (Moore, Suzette) Modified on 9/25/2019 (BIA).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Esprit Model, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15937104) filed by Voice Control Vehicles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Moore, Suzette) Modified on 9/19/2019 (MAA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voice Control Vehicles, LLC v. Esprit Model, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esprit Model, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voice Control Vehicles, LLC
Represented By: Suzette Marteny Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?