Proxicom Wireless, LLC v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Proxicom Wireless, LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01886
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Reset deadlines for Target Corporation: Answer due by 12/4/2019. (MAA)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond re #1 Complaint. Target Corporation answer or response due 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/27/2019. (MKH)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Target Corporation. (Waggoner, Dennis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Parker Waggoner on behalf of Target Corporation (Waggoner, Dennis)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time and to Appear at the Case Management Conference Telephonically. The Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before November 27, 2019. The parties shall conduct the case management conference on or before December 13, 2019. The parties shall file the Case Management Report no later than seven days after the date of the case management conference. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/25/2019. (MDH)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to File Case Management Report and for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically by Proxicom Wireless, LLC. (Ford, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The parties are directed to submit the attached Case Management Report upon completion of the Case Management Conference. (ctp) (JLC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. New case number: 6:19-cv-01886-Orl-37LRH. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Executed on 10/4/19 as to the Defendant Target Corporation by Proxicom Wireless, LLC (Ford, Taylor) Modified on 10/8/2019 (RDO).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER transferring case to the Honorable Roy B. Dalton. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/7/2019. (SCM)
October 7, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Denise M. De Mory, appearing on behalf of Proxicom Wireless, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL085959.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Denise M. De Mory to appear pro hac vice. (BIA)
October 7, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Chris J. Coulson, appearing on behalf of Proxicom Wireless, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL085959.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Chris J. Coulson to appear pro hac vice. (BIA)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/4/2019. (MDH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Chris J. Coulson to appear pro hac vice by Proxicom Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Copy of Special Admission Attorney Certification for Chris J. Coulson)(Ford, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Denise M. De Mory to appear pro hac vice by Proxicom Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Copy of Special Admission Attorney Certification for Denise M. De Mory)(Ford, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Proxicom Wireless, LLC. (Ford, Taylor)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Proxicom Wireless, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Ford, Taylor)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/4/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/4/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (RDO)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Target Corporation. (RDO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1886-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15983956) filed by Proxicom Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Ford, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proxicom Wireless, LLC v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proxicom Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Flanagan Ford
Represented By: Denise M. De Mory
Represented By: Dustin Michael Mauser-Claassen
Represented By: Chris J. Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?