CTAF Solutions, LLC v. Avidyne Corporation
Plaintiff: CTAF Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Avidyne Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01906
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have until and through December 19, 2019, to file its Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/21/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2019, to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avidyne Corporation. (Barnett, Eleanor) Modified on 11/21/2019 (SPM).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Defendant may have until and through December 19, 2019, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/19/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2019, to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Avidyne Corporation. (Barnett, Eleanor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 11/18/2019 (SPM).
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Trotman Barnett on behalf of Avidyne Corporation (Barnett, Eleanor)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #11 Parties' Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint; denying without prejudice #13 Parties' Amended Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/14/2019. (JLE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 Amended STIPULATION/MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2019, to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Avidyne Corporation. (McNabnay, Neil) Modified on 11/13/2019 (SPM).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by defendant by 11/27/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/13/2019. (DJD) ctp
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION/MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2019, to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Avidyne Corporation. (McNabnay, Neil) Modified on 11/12/2019 (SPM).
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 10/29/2019 by CTAF Solutions, LLC as to Avidyne Corporation. (Wernow, Howard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by CTAF Solutions, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/21/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 10/7/2019. (DJD) ctp
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Avidyne Corporation. (SPM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (SPM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1906-Orl-41EJK. (SJB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by CTAF Solutions, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified on 10/7/2019 (SPM).
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avidyne Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15994764) filed by CTAF Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 10,389,396, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTAF Solutions, LLC v. Avidyne Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avidyne Corporation
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: Eleanor Trotman Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTAF Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?