Graybill v. Kolb
Appellant: Gary R. Graybill
Appellee: Susan Kolb and Robert E. Thomas, As Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Catherine Eckley Bentley
Case Number: 6:2019cv02026
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Paul G Byron
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/13/2019. (SCM)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #14 Motion to Transfer Case. See #17 Order Transferring Case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/13/2019. (SCM)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:19-cv-2026-ORL-40. Judge Wendy W. Berger no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable District Judge Paul G. Byron for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/12/2019. (MDJ)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Gary R. Graybill. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Handy, Anna)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to intervene by Robert E. Thomas, As Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Catherine Eckley Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order on Credit)(McKean, Esther)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to transfer case to the Honorable Paul G. Byron by Susan Kolb. (McKean, Esther) Modified on 12/9/2019 (SPM).
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on Supplemental Transmittal including: (Attachments: #1 Case 18-ap-00045 Dkt #1 Complaint: Exhibits F through O)filed by Gary R. Graybill.(VC)
November 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 10/23/2019. (ALL)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on Supplemental Transmittal, Dkt #186 on case no.6:17-bk-00294-KSJ, including: (Attachments: #1 Case No. 6:18-ap-00045, Dkt #1 Complaint by Robert E Thomas against Auctions America by RM, Inc., #2 Case No. 6:18-ap-00045, Dkt #15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, #3 Case No. 6:18-ap-00045, Dkt #19 Objection to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Case No. 6:18-ap-00045, Dkt #28 Amended Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Conversion, Count I)filed by Gary R. Graybill.(VC)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #185 Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District Court including: (Attachments: #1 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #132 Order Denying Discharge of Debtor. Final Judgment in Section 727 Complaint, #2 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #153 Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement, #3 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #161 Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement, #4 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #163 Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #5 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #164 Objection to Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #6 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #168 Order Denying Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #7 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #170 Notice of Appeal, #8 Case 16:17-bk-00294, Dkt #178 Transcript Regarding Hearing Held October 2, 2019, #9 Case 6:17-ap-00047, Dkt #1 Complaint by Susan Kolb against Catherine Eckley Bentley, #10 Case 6:17-ap-00047, Dkt #46 Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff, #11 Case 6:17-ap-00047, Dkt #59 Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #12 Case 6:17-ap-00047, Dkt #60 Objection to Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #13 Case 6:17-ap-00047, Dkt #64 Order Denying Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #14 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #1 Complaint by Susan Kolb, M.D. against Catherine Eckley Bentley, #15 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #119 Memorandum Opinion Denying the Debtor's Discharge and Resolving Trial Matters, #16 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #145 Final Judgment in Favor of Susan Kolb, M.D., #17 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #153 Satisfaction of Judgment, #18 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #165 Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #19 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #166 Objection to Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment, #20 Case 6:17-ap-00119, Dkt #171 Order Denying Motion for Credit Against Final Judgment)filed by Gary R. Graybill.(VC)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re 8 Order no pdf filed by Gary R. Graybill. (Handy, Anna)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a)(1), Appellant's brief was due on Friday, November 22, 2019. On or before November 29, 2019, Appellant shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to prosecute the appeal. Appellant shall file his brief by 5:00pm on November 29, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the appeal or other appropriate sanctions pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a)(4) and Local Rule 3.10(a). Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/26/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gary R. Graybill. Related case(s): yes (Handy, Anna) Modified on 11/13/2019 (MEJ).
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Gary R. Graybill. (Handy, Anna)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Susan Kolb. Related case(s): yes (McKean, Esther)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Susan Kolb. (McKean, Esther)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/28/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/28/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Gary R. Graybill. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:17-bk-294-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Order, #3 Order, #4 Order)(ALL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graybill v. Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gary R. Graybill
Represented By: Anna Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Susan Kolb
Represented By: Esther Anna McKean
Represented By: Samual A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert E. Thomas, As Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Catherine Eckley Bentley
Represented By: Esther Anna McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?