Hanna v. Orlando Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Deborah Hanna
Defendant: Orlando Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 6:2019cv02126
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Reset deadline: for Orlando Federal Credit Union. Answer to the Complaint due by 1/15/2020. (KNC)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Defendant may have until and through January 15, 2020, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/27/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Orlando Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krause, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Orlando Federal Credit Union. (Krause, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant Orlando Federal Credit Union shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/12/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have until and through December 26, 2019, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/4/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Orlando Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krause, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on November 15, 2019 by Deborah Hanna as to Orlando Federal Credit Union. (Shrader, Brian)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Deborah Hanna. (Shrader, Brian)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Deborah Hanna. Related case(s): no (Shrader, Brian)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/8/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/8/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Orlando Federal Credit Union. (MEJ)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-2126-ORL-40EJK. (LRB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orlando Federal Credit Union with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16119563) filed by Deborah Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shrader, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna v. Orlando Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Matthew G. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Hanna
Represented By: Brian Lucas Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?