Luna v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Orange County)
Petitioner: Daniel Luna
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 6:2019cv02145
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections. Related case(s): yes (Parrish, Bonnie) Modified on 1/2/2020 (DMA).
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Jean Parrish on behalf of Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections (Parrish, Bonnie)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to respond and show cause within 90 days why the petition should not be granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Habeas petition)(LAK)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Daniel Luna. Related case(s): no (DMA)
November 20, 2019 FEES paid by Daniel Luna (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number ORL086989) (ARJ)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 11/18/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Daniel Luna.(MEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Orange County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?