U.S. Bank, National Association v. Kumar et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Seminole Woods Community Assocation, Inc., Krishna Kumar, Mortgage Electronic Registration Sysems, Inc., Anupama Kumar and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv02164
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER remanding case to the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/17/2019. (SCM)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #8 Amended Notice of Removal. On or before Monday, December 16, 2019, Defendant is DIRECTED to file a second amended Notice of Removal that remedies the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to properly allege jurisdiction may result in this case being remanded without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/2/2019. (SCM)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion to Remand. The Motion is rendered moot by the filing of Plaintiff's #8 Amended Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/2/2019. (SCM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent by Krishna Kumar re #8 Notice of Removal (RDO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Anupama Kumar. (RDO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anupama Kumar. Related case(s): yes (RDO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 (STRICKEN BY #13 ORDER) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-02929-14N-K filed in State Court on 9/16/19. filed by Anupama Kumar.(RDO) Modified on 12/3/2019 (RDO).
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to remand to state court by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Bates, Morgan) Modified on 11/26/2019 (RDO).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking #1 Notice of Removal. On or before Monday, December 2, 2019, Defendant is DIRECTED to file an amended Notice of Removal that remedies the deficiencies identified in this Order. Defendant's Motion to Quash Service of Process #2 is DENIED AS MOOT because the Court cannot determine at this time whether it has jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/18/2019. (SCM)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed/mailed
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/15/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/15/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to quash Service of Process by Anupama Kumar. (originally filed in State Court on 11/4/19) (RDO)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-002929-14N-K filed in State Court on 9/16/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL086742 filed by Anupama Kumar. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents)(RDO) Modified on 11/14/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. Kumar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Woods Community Assocation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishna Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Sysems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anupama Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Brian L. Rosaler
Represented By: Richard P. Cohn
Represented By: Morgan Whitney Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?