Stoneway Capital Corporation v. Siemens Energy Inc.
Plaintiff: Stoneway Capital Corporation
Defendant: Siemens Energy Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv02183
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Southern District of New York as case 1:19-cv-11355, filed on 12/12/2019. (MAA)
December 10, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Siemens Energy Inc..(Lincoln, Jesse)
December 9, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSFER to the District of Southern District of New York. (MAA)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to transfer case to Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/9/2019. (LAM)
December 6, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Siemens Energy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lincoln, Jesse) Modified on 12/9/2019 (MEJ).
December 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stoneway Capital Corporation. Related case(s): no (Drecktrah Paz, Kristin)
December 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of pendency of related cases #8 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Siemens Energy Inc. Related case(s): No (Lincoln, Jesse) Modified on 12/4/2019 (MEJ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for motion proceedings held before Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/2/2019 re #3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Stoneway Capital Corporation. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters. (LAM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Stoneway Capital Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Stoneway Energy International LP, Other Affiliate Stoneway Energy LP, Other Affiliate Stoneway Group LP, Other Affiliate Stoneway Capital Ltd, Other Affiliate Araucaria Energy S.A., Other Affiliate SPI Energy S.A., Other Affiliate Araucaria Power Generation S.A., Other Affiliate Araucaria Generation S.A. for Stoneway Capital Corporation.. (Patricoff, Harold)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #22 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/2/2019. (LAM)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Defendant's Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/2/2019. (LAM)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice. Lee C. Davis, Esq., Jesse W. Lincoln, Esq., and Kamryn M. Deegan, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendant with Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr., Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/2/2019. (MKH)
December 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority filed by Siemens Energy Inc.(Sowell, Robert) Modified on 12/2/2019 (MEJ).
December 1, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically laptops, tablet, and cell phones by Siemens Energy Inc.. (Thielhelm, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (EXPEDITED) filed by Siemens Energy Inc. (Thielhelm, Robert).
November 29, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of re #3 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (EXPEDITED) by Stoneway Capital Corporation. (Drecktrah Paz, Kristin) Modified on 12/2/2019 (MEJ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #9 Interested persons order by Siemens Energy Inc. (Thielhelm, Robert) Modified on 11/29/2019 (BIA).
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION to Admitting Plaintiff's "Verified Complaint" Into Evidence re #1 Complaint. (Thielhelm, Robert) Modified on 11/29/2019 (BIA).
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Siemens Energy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Thielhelm, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Stoneway Capital Corporation. (Drecktrah Paz, Kristin)
November 27, 2019 Sealed Document (S-17). (RDO)
November 27, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kamryn M. Deegan, appearing on behalf of Siemens Energy Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087131.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Kamryn M. Deegan to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
November 27, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jesse Lincoln, appearing on behalf of Siemens Energy Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087130.) Related document: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Jesse M. Lincoln to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
November 27, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Lee C. Davis, appearing on behalf of Siemens Energy Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087129.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Lee C. Davis to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Kamryn M. Deegan to appear pro hac vice by Siemens Energy Inc.. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Jesse M. Lincoln to appear pro hac vice by Siemens Energy Inc.. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Lee C. Davis to appear pro hac vice by Siemens Energy Inc.. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/27/2019. (MKH)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to file under seal or, in the alternative, for permission to provide hard-copy version of document to the Court by Stoneway Capital Corporation. (Drecktrah Paz, Kristin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Amended RETURN of service executed on 11/19/2019 by Stoneway Capital Corporation as to Siemens Energy Inc. (Patricoff, Harold) Modified on 11/21/2019 (BIA).
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 11/19/2019 by Stoneway Capital Corporation as to Siemens Energy Inc. (Patricoff, Harold) Modified text on 11/20/2019. (AEJ)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/19/2019. (LAM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/19/2019. (LAM)
November 18, 2019 Set/reset deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction With Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (BIA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of non-evidentiary hearing on motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction With Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. (LAM)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs shall accomplish service of the motion upon the Defendants on or before November 20, 2019. And it is further ORDERED that the Defendants shall file a response to the motion on or before November 27, 2019. In addition, TAKE NOTICE that a non-evidentiary hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 3) is scheduled for Monday, December 2, 2019 at 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/18/2019. (MAF)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Siemens Energy Inc.. (RDO)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2183-Orl-31LRH. (SJB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Stoneway Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patricoff, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stoneway Capital Corporation. (Patricoff, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Stoneway Capital Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16153061) filed by Stoneway Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Patricoff, Harold) Modified on 11/18/2019 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoneway Capital Corporation v. Siemens Energy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stoneway Capital Corporation
Represented By: Harold E. Patricoff
Represented By: Kristin Drecktrah Paz
Represented By: Maureen Kelly Rogers
Represented By: Michael David Crosbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy Inc.
Represented By: Kamryn M. Deegan
Represented By: Jesse M Lincoln
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Represented By: Lee C. Davis
Represented By: Jesse W. Lincoln
Represented By: Robert Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?