Levesque v. City of West Melbourne et al
Plaintiff: Dianne Levesque
Defendant: Jacob Mathis, City of West Melbourne, Danielle Quinn and Kevin Krukowski
Case Number: 6:2019cv02187
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A in re #30 Amended Complaint by Dianne Levesque (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Administration)(Moore, John) Modified on 1/15/2020 (MEJ).
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Dianne Levesque (Related document #1).(Moore, John) Modified on 1/13/2020 (MEJ).
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vernon Moore on behalf of Dianne Levesque (Moore, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 **Duplicate Filing at DE. #29 ** NOTICE of Appearance by John Vernon Moore on behalf of Dianne Levesque (Holland, Gary) Modified on 1/13/2020 (MEJ).
January 9, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 8, 2021 at 9:00 am before Donna Doyle. (Mari, Frank)
January 3, 2020 Filing 31 CASE REFERRED to Mediation.
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020, Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 6/18/2021, All other motions due by 6/25/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/3/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #22 Motion to Strike due to the Court's #24 Order on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/23/2019. (Irick, Daniel)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying as moot #10 motion to dismiss; denying as moot #11 motion to dismiss; granting #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #23 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Quinn are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an Amended Complaint pertaining only to the remaining Defendants on or before Friday, January 10, 2020. Failure to timely file will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Defendants are DIRECTED to answer the Amended Complaint on or before Friday, January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/23/2019. (JRR) (JRR). Modified on 1/2/2020 (JRR).
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Kevin Krukowski, Jacob Mathis, Danielle Quinn. (Reynolds, Lyman) Modified on 12/23/2019 (RDO).
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Strike and/or Motion for Repleader with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Kevin Krukowski, Jacob Mathis, Danielle Quinn. (Reynolds, Lyman) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 12/23/2019 (RDO).
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Reynolds, Lyman)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kevin Krukowski, Jacob Mathis, Danielle Quinn. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Lyman) Modified on 12/6/2019 (MEJ).
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyman H. Reynolds, Jr on behalf of Kevin Krukowski, Jacob Mathis, Danielle Quinn (Reynolds, Lyman)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kevin Krukowski, Jacob Mathis, Danielle Quinn. Related case(s): yes (Reynolds, Lyman)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Dianne Levesque. (Holland, Gary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order, #15 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dianne Levesque. (Holland, Gary)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested Persons Order by Kevin Krukowski, Jacob Mathis, Danielle Quinn. (Reynolds, Lyman) Modified on 11/27/2019 (RDO).
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by City of West Melbourne.(Mari, Frank)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Danielle Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Reynolds, Lyman)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by City of West Melbourne. (Mari, Frank)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jacob Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Reynolds, Lyman)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Kevin Krukowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Reynolds, Lyman)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Danielle Quinn. (Reynolds, Lyman) Modified to edit text on 11/20/2019 (KKH).
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Jacob Mathis (Reynolds, Lyman) Modified to edit text on 11/20/2019 (KKH).
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Kevin Krukowski (Reynolds, Lyman) Modified to edit text on 11/20/2019 (KKH).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by City of West Melbourne. Related case(s): yes (Mari, Frank)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/18/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/18/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-2187-Orl-40DCI. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Mari on behalf of City of West Melbourne (Mari, Frank)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2019-CA-052135-XXXX-XX filed in State Court on 10/28/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16155353 filed by City of West Melbourne. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mari, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levesque v. City of West Melbourne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Mathis
Represented By: Lyman H. Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Melbourne
Represented By: Frank Mari
Represented By: Michael J. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Quinn
Represented By: Lyman H. Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Krukowski
Represented By: Lyman H. Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Levesque
Represented By: John Vernon Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?