Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Renesas Electronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bell Semiconductor, LLC
Defendant: Renesas Electronics America Inc. and Renesas Electronics Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv02196
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. Related case(s): No (Ramirez, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc., Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC for Bell Semiconductor, LLC.. (Ramirez, Joseph)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. The responses are due by 3/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/5/2019. (MB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/02/2019 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC as to Renesas Electronics America Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/03/2019 by Bell Semiconductor, LLC Waiver of Service sent on 11/25/2019 as to Renesas Electronics Corporation. (Santurri, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY OUT-OF-STATE COUNSEL PAUL J. SKIERMONT; granting #9 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY OUT OF-STATE COUNSEL STEVEN W. HARTSELL; granting #10 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY OUT-OF-STATE COUNSEL JAIME K. OLIN; granting #11 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY OUT-OF-STATE COUNSEL JOSEPH M. RAMIREZ; granting #12 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY OUT-OF-STATE COUNSEL CHARLES C. KOOLE, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/3/2019. (MB)
December 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles C. Koole, appearing on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087216.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Charles C. Koole to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
December 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joseph M. Ramirez, appearing on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087216.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Joseph M. Ramirez to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
December 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jaime K. Olin, appearing on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087216.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Jaime K. Olin to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
December 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Steven W. Hartsell, appearing on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087216.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Steven W. Hartsell to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
December 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Paul J. Skiermont, appearing on behalf of Bell Semiconductor, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL087216.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Paul J. Skiermont to appear pro hac vice. (ARJ)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/2/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/2/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/2/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Charles C. Koole to appear pro hac vice by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joseph M. Ramirez to appear pro hac vice by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Jaime K. Olin to appear pro hac vice by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Steven W. Hartsell to appear pro hac vice by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Paul J. Skiermont to appear pro hac vice by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Renesas Electronics America Inc. (LDJ)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Renesas Electronics Corporation. (LDJ)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Copies mailed) (LDJ)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Paul J. Skiermont, Steven W. Hartsell, Jaime K. Olin, Joseph M. Ramirez, and Charles C. Koole of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2196-Orl-78GJK. (SJB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc., Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC for Bell Semiconductor, LLC.. (Santurri, Ryan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Renesas Electronics America Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16158702) filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US6068879, #2 Exhibit 2 - US6153543, #3 Exhibit 3 - US6281129, #4 Exhibit 4 - US6727588, #5 Exhibit 5 - US6879046, #6 Exhibit 6 - US6960836, #7 Exhibit 7 - US6083271, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons Renesas Electronics Corporation, #10 Proposed Summons Renesas Electronics America Inc.)(Santurri, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. Renesas Electronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Electronics America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bell Semiconductor, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Santurri
Represented By: Jaime K. Olin
Represented By: Steven W. Hartsell
Represented By: Joseph M. Ramirez
Represented By: Paul Joseph Skiermont
Represented By: Charles C. Koole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?