Deng v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Xiumei Deng
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv02214
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Julie Walbroel appointed as Mediator. (BIA)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2020, Discovery due by 1/29/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/2/2021, Pretrial statement due by 7/5/2021, All other motions due by 6/1/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/1/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/31/2020, Trial Status Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 8/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/12/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/15/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Coleman, James)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Xiumei Deng. (Pugh, Jason)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Xiumei Deng. Related case(s): no (Pugh, Jason)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Target Corporation. (Coleman, James)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Target Corporation. Related case(s): no (Coleman, James)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/26/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/25/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/25/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2214-Orl-78GJK. (SJB)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (Coleman, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant, Target Corporation's, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 11/15/19 by Target Corporation.(Coleman, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed in Orange County Circuit Court on 10/29/2019 against Target Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Target Corporation.(Coleman, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-013231-O filed in State Court on October 29, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16168542 filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coleman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deng v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: James A. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiumei Deng
Represented By: Jason M. Pugh
Represented By: Daniel M. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?