Johnson v. Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv02252
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Byrd, Tucker)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may conduct the case management conference telephonically for the purpose of preparing the Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.. (Nwamah, Kingsley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service to all parties by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice (Taormina, Alisa) Modified on 1/2/2020 (SPM).
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Taormina, Alisa)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Johnson. Related case(s): no (Byrd, Tucker)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/31/2019 and submitted by Michael Johnson. (Byrd, Tucker)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Michael Johnson. (Byrd, Tucker)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/31/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for Chase Bankcard Services, Inc... (Taormina, Alisa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.. (Taormina, Alisa)
December 2, 2019 Set deadlines: for Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. Answer due by 12/6/2019. (SPM)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss in light of [1-1] Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/2/2019. (KMS)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file its response to the amended complaint on or before December 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/2/2019. (MDH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 6, 2019, to File Answer to Complaint by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nwamah, Kingsley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 11/27/2019 (SPM).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/29/2019. (SPM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2252-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteen Judicial Circuit, Seminole County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-00832-16C-G filed in State Court on 3/15/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16193352 filed by Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frontino, Brian) Modified on 11/27/2019 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Scottie McPherson
Represented By: Julia M. Wischmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian C. Frontino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Frontino
Represented By: Kingsley Chinedu Nwamah
Represented By: Alisa M. Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?