Louisius v. Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLP et al
Plaintiff: Max Louisius
Defendant: RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL, ENERSON & HORNIK llp and Cascade Capital, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv02283
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #11 Notice of settlement. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/13/2020. (RMF)(ctp).
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of full settlement by Max Louisius (Phillips, Jason) Modified on 1/10/2020 (LDJ).
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Cascade Capital, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLP. (DMA)
December 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Max Louisius. (Phillips, Jason)
December 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Max Louisius. Related case(s): Yes (Phillips, Jason) Modified on 12/9/2019 (DMA).
December 7, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Max Louisius. (Phillips, Jason)
December 7, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Max Louisius. (Phillips, Jason)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/5/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/19/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/5/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/19/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/5/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2283-Orl-78GJK. (SJB)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cascade Capital, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLP with Jury Demand filed by Max Louisius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Phillips, Jason) Modified on 12/4/2019 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisius v. Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Louisius
Represented By: Jason Brian Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL, ENERSON & HORNIK llp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?