McDuffie v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Shawn McDuffie
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 6:2019cv02288
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (BIA)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to stay proceeding by Shawn McDuffie. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #9 Order on exparte motion for miscellaneous reliefOrder on Motion for Extension of Time to File by Shawn McDuffie. Filing fee not paid. (BIA)
January 23, 2020 HABEAS FEES paid by Shawn McDuffie (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number ORL088356) (ARJ) Modified on 1/23/2020 (BIA).
January 8, 2020 Set/reset deadlines: Fee payment due by 1/24/2020 (BIA)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Exparte motion for miscellaneous relief; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Petitioner shall have until January 24, 2020, to pay the $5.00 filing fee. On or before January 24, 2020, he may file a memorandum of law in support of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) that shall not exceed twenty pages in length. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/8/2020. (RN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Reset the Time Period that was Previously Granted to File Memorandum Brief by Shawn McDuffie. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to FileOrder on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shawn McDuffie. (BIA)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (JLC)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In order to continue the prosecution of this case, Petitioner shall, within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this order, pay $5.00 to the Clerk of the Court. Petitioner's Motion to File Memorandum of Law (Doc. 3) is GRANTED. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Petitioner may file a memorandum of law that shall not exceed twenty pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/9/2019. (SPM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum Brief in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn McDuffie. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn McDuffie. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Account Statement)(BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Shawn McDuffie.(BIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDuffie v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn McDuffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?