Hadley v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Willie Hadley
Defendant: Justin L. Parker, Mark K. Hall, Lori A. Hoenemeyer, United States of America and Fernando E. Del-Vecchio
Case Number: 6:2019cv02315
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be denied and that the #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/5/2020. (RMN) (RMN).
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Willie Hadley. (DMA)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Willie Hadley. Related case(s): no (DMA)
January 3, 2020 Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 1/20/2020 (DMA)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies addressed in this Order on or before January 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (RMN)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/31/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie Hadley. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fernando E. Del-Vecchio, Mark K. Hall, Lori A. Hoenemeyer, Justin L. Parker, United States of America with Jury Demand filed by Willie Hadley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadley v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark K. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A. Hoenemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando E. Del-Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?