United States of America v. $361,407 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $361,407 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: James J. Larris
Case Number: 6:2019cv02349
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Claim Form re #15 Notice (Other) by James J. Larris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rush, Robert) Modified on 1/31/2020 (MEJ).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge for case management, ruling on non-dispositive motions and to enter a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/28/2020. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Claim by James J. Larris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim Form)(Rush, Robert) Modified on 1/28/2020 (BIA).
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government internet site, (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning on December 19, 2019 and ending on January 17, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by James J. Larris. (Rush, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement for Claimant James J. Larris due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/6/2020. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED document by $361,407 in U.S. Currency. Amendment to #8 Notice of appearance on behalf of Claimant, James J. Larris. (Rush, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 US Marshal 285 form for arresting the currency and serving the Complaint and Warrant in Rem on 12/27/19. (MEJ)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Claimant James J. Larris . Related case(s): yes (Rush, Robert) Modified on 1/28/2020 to reflect correct party (AKC).
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Anthony Rush on behalf of Claimant James J. Larris (Rush, Robert) Modified on 1/28/2020 to reflect correct party(AKC).
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by United States of America. (Andrejko, Nicole)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/19/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Pursuant toRule G(3)(b)(i), Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the government is directed to immediately provide the warrant to the Clerk, and the Clerk is directed to issue the Warrant of Arrest In Rem. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/16/2019. (RN)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (MEJ)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $361,407 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $361,407 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $361,407 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James J. Larris
Represented By: Robert Anthony Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?