Romero o/b/o K.S.Q. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2019cv02381
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF of service by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q. (MEJ)
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q. (MEJ)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (MEJ)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 6:19-cv-2381-Orl-22JRK. Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman no longer assigned to the case. (SMS)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MEJ)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.. (Culbertson, Richard) Modified on 1/3/2020 (MEJ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.. (Culbertson, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.. Related case(s): No (Culbertson, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (MAA)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/19/2019. (RMF)(ctp).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. On or before January 2, 2020, Plaintiff may renew her request to proceed in forma pauperis by filing a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Alternatively, on or before January 2, 2020, Plaintiff must pay the required filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/18/2019. (MKH)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2381-Orl-22LRH. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (SJB)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.. (Culbertson, Richard)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero o/b/o K.S.Q. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanette N. Romero o/b/o K.S.Q.
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?