Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC v. Walt Disney Company
Plaintiff: Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Walt Disney Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv02396
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #6 Related Case Order by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1)(Wernow, Howard) Modified on 1/8/2020 (RDO).
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/26/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/26/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (RDO)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Walt Disney Company. (RDO)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2396-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walt Disney Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16280283) filed by Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat. No. 8,089,980, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC v. Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blueprint IP Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?