Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. a/s/o Southern States Pavement Markings, Inc. and Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv02401
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 21 CASE REFERRED to Mediation (Mediator: Phil King). (DMA)
February 6, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/22/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/8/2020, Conduct mediation hearing by 2/15/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 7/2/2021, All other motions due by 7/12/2021, Jury Trial set for 9/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II.(DMA)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/6/2020. (BRS)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Merrill, Michael)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/30/2020. (Kidd, Embry)
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (Rothman, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/03/2020. (RMN)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (Rothman, Steven)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Rothman, Steven)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc..(Rothman, Steven)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc., may have until and through January 10, 2020, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/30/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. for Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Merrill, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Merrill, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #7 Interested persons order by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kumbo Tire Co., Inc. for Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. (Rothman, Steven) Modified on 12/30/2019 (LDJ).
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Until 1/10/20 to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Rothman, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 12/30/2019 (LDJ).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for both Plaintiff and Defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/27/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/27/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Defendant must file a motion that complies with Local Rule 3.01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/24/2019. (Kidd, Embry)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Chad W. Dunham of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-2401-Orl-28EJK. (SJB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc. in Volusia County Court on 12/17/19. (MAA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Seventh Judicial Circuit, Volusia County, case number 2019-32114-CICI filed in State Court on November 19, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16282502 filed by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 State Court Pending Motions Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time, #3 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Summons, #5 State Court Other Documents Civil Cover Sheet - State, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Federal)(Rothman, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. a/s/o Southern States Pavement Markings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?