DGVault, LLC v. Dunne
Plaintiff: DGVault, LLC
Defendant: ArcoInfo, Inc., Kyle Dunne, ABC Corps. 1-3, William Dunne and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 6:2020cv00074
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE to counsel (David Gorvitz, Laurence B. Orloff, Matthew Thomas Aslanian, and Shalom David Stone) of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 58 TRANSFER IN from the New Jersey. Case assigned to District Judge Dalton and Magistrate Judge Kidd. New Case Number: 6:20-cv-74-ORL-37EJK. (MAA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:18-cv-14152. File received electronically
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Defendants' motion to transfer to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida; the Clerk of Court shall terminate docket entry #23. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATE. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/6/2020. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 55 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/6/2020. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Reset Hearing: Tomorrow's Telephone Status Conference is adjourned to 2/7/2020 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that fact discovery is to remain open until 1/31/2020; depositions of fact witnesses and individuals are to be completed by 1/31/2020; all affirmative expert reports shall be delivered by 3/1/2020; all responding expert reports by 4/15/2010; expert discovery shall be completed by 5/15/2020; there will be a Telephone Conference on 12/20/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer, plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/2/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 53 Letter from all Parties re 52 Order,,. (STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER: In light of the November 7, 2019, D.E. 51, letter to the Court, tomorrow's in-person meet and confer is adjourned sine die. By November 29, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court and to the extent that the parties seek an extension of any existing deadline, they shall so indicate in their letter and shall propose new deadlines. The parties shall also include in this letter a proposed date for the next telephone conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/7/19. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 51 Letter from all Parties. (STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER: DATE CHANGES ONLY! In relation to the prior text order, the in- Court meet and confer shall now occur in the Courtroom of the Undersigned at 10:00 a.m. on November 8, 2019. No later than 3:00 p.m. on November 7, 2019, the parties will JOINTLY inform the Court whether they have resolved the disputes, or whether the in-Court meet and confer will occur as scheduled on November 8th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/21/19. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' October 18, 2019 joint letter [D.E. 48]. The parties are reminded that the deadline for raising discovery disputes expired on September 15, 2019, pursuant to the Court's July 8, 2019 Amended Scheduling Order [D.E. 45], and no party thereafter sought to amend the schedule. Accordingly, if the parties cannot resolve the disputes themselves by November 10, 2019, they are to appear in the Courtroom of the Undersigned at 10:00 a.m. on November 11, 2019. The parties will be prepared to meet and confer until the earlier of: (1) complete resolution of all disputes, or (2) 4:00 p.m., when the Court will address the remaining issues with the parties. No later than 3:00 p.m. on November 8, 2019, the parties will JOINTLY inform the Court whether they have resolved the disputes, or whether the in-Court meet and confer will occur as scheduled on November 11th. Regarding the location of the depositions of the Defendants, the general presumption is that the deposition of a defendant occurs in the district of that defendant's residence or place of business. See, e.g., Thomas v. IBM, 48 F.3d 478, 483 (10th Cir. 1995); Salter v. Upjohn, 593 F.2d 649, 651 (5th Cir. 1979). Here, Defendants appear to have agreed to travel to New Jersey rather than require Plaintiff's counsel to travel to Florida. Plaintiff has not articulated any clear or compelling need to conduct the depositions at his office. Accordingly, the depositions shall take place at Stone Conroy LLC. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/21/2019. (MAH) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 48 Letter from All Parties to Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #47 Order,,. (STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER with respect to the dispute between the parties regarding Defendant's propounded interrogatories 10, 11 and 13 Plaintiff shall amend its responses to provide more fulsome responses as discussed on the record; the parties shall meet and confer regarding any disputes on the remaining interrogatories; with respect to Plaintiff's document production requests 2, 10 and 16 the Court will not require Defendant to produce anything additional at this time; by 10/17/2019 the parties shall file a joint letter, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/8/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/7/2019. (ECR) (jqb, ) Modified on 10/8/2019 (jqb, ). [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 46 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, the parties shall complete written discovery by 8/8/2019; a Telephone Status Conference is set for 10/7/2019 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/8/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/8/2019. (No Court Reporter/Recorder) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID GORVITZ on behalf of DGVAULT, LLC (GORVITZ, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 43 Letter from Laurence B. Orloff to Hon. Michael A. Hammer. (ORLOFF, LAURENCE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE B ORLOFF on behalf of DGVAULT, LLC (ORLOFF, LAURENCE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 6/25/2019 is adjourned to 7/8/2019 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/7/2019. (No Court Reporter/Recorder) (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone status conference with the Undersigned on June 25, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall kindly initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/7/19. (TAD) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/18/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 39 Letter from Matthew Aslanian Submitting Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Discovery Confidentiality Order)(ASLANIAN, MATTHEW) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER extending the deadline for written discovery until 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/19/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER extending the deadline for exchange of written discovery for two weeks to 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/19/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 36 Letter from Plaintiff Requesting Extension of Paper Discovery Exchange Deadlines re #32 Scheduling Order,. (ASLANIAN, MATTHEW) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by DGVAULT, LLC Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic Filing as to case. Attorney JULIE LEVINSON WERNER terminated. (WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 34 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JULIE LEVINSON WERNER terminated.. (ASLANIAN, MATTHEW) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW THOMAS ASLANIAN on behalf of DGVAULT, LLC (ASLANIAN, MATTHEW) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/7/2019 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer, plaintiff's counsel will initiate the call. Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2019. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 11/30/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/11/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 2/11/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Julie Levinson Werner to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 30 Joint Discovery Plan by DGVAULT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/24/2019. (jqb, ) (Main Document 29 replaced on 1/24/2019) (jqb, ). [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 Transcript of Oral Argument held on November 7, 2018, before Judge Esther Salas. Court Reporter: Mary Jo Monteleone (973-580-5262). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 2/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (jml, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from J. Levinson Werner to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. requesting a Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ARCOINFO, INC, WILLIAM DUNNE, Kyle Dunne re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Venue, etc. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kyle Dunne)(STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ARCOINFO, INC, WILLIAM DUNNE, Kyle Dunne re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Venue, etc. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kyle Dunne)(STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DGVAULT, LLC re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Venue, etc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Mann, #2 Declaration of H. Seward, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6, #9 Exhibit Ex. 7, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10, #13 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 7, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Venue, etc.. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Venue, etc. by ARCOINFO, INC, WILLIAM DUNNE, Kyle Dunne. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of William Dunne, #3 Exhibit A to William Dunne Cert., #4 Certification of Kyle Dunne, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 Letter from J. Werner to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing Plaintiff's Injunction Bond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Injunction Bond, #2 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the Court notes that Plaintiff had notice of the bond requirement since the hearing held on 11/7/2018. The Court will grant this request, but no further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. If Plaintiff fails to post the security within the granted time, Defendants may seek modification of the preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/27/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 Letter from J. Werner to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. requesting extension to post bond. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, Plaintiff's application for expedited discovery is denied; Plaintiff shall post a $75,000 bond within 7 days hereof, etc. (Finance notified) Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/14/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 Letter from Shalom D. Stone, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 17 Letter from J. Werner to The Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2018 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DGVAULT, LLC. Opinion read into the record. Ordered motion granted. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Regarding D.E. No. 12, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is the operative complaint in this action. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a), a plaintiff may amend its pleading as a matter of course at any time before responsive pleadings is served. See Centifanti v. Nix, 865 F.2d 1422, 1431 (3d Cir. 1989). Because no responsive pleadings had been served, Plaintiff did not need leave of court. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 11/5/2018. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SHALOM DAVID STONE on behalf of WILLIAM DUNNE (STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Verified Complaint against Kyle Dunne, ARCOINFO, INC, filed by DGVAULT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Kyle Dunne, #3 Summons to ArcoInfo, Inc., #4 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from J. Levinson Werner to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DGVAULT, LLC re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas Mann, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion filed by WILLIAM DUNNE re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Dunne, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(STONE, SHALOM) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by WILLIAM DUNNE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2018. Plaintiff filed a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on 9/21/2018. Opposition to be filed by 10/26/2018. Reply to be filed by 10/30/2018. Oral Argument scheduled for 11/7/2018 at 1:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold the scheduled telephonic conference today at 2 p.m. The Court will permit pro se Defendant's Florida attorney to participate on his behalf only for purposes of today's conference. Plaintiff's Counsel shall kindly coordinate. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 10/9/2018. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope, #2 Notice of Unavailability, #3 Consent and Registration to receive electronic notifications) (sm) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephonic conference with the parties at 2:00 p.m. on 10/9/2018. Plaintiff's counsel shall kindly coordinate the call and shall inform the Defendant of the teleconference. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 10/2/2018. (ps, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law, Declaration of D. Mann, Declaration of J. Ullman, Proposed Order to Show Cause Seeking Preliminary Injunction, Certificate of Service served on William Dunne on 9/28/2018, filed by DGVAULT, LLC. (WERNER, JULIE) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 CORRECTED DECLARATION of DOUGLAS MANN re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DGVAULT, LLC. (fp, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WILLIAM DUNNE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (fp, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (fp, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DGVAULT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration Douglas Mann, #3 Declaration Justin Ullman, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(fp, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM DUNNE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW037479), filed by DGVAULT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fp, ) Modified on 9/24/2018 (fp, ). [Transferred from njd on 1/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DGVault, LLC v. Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArcoInfo, Inc.
Represented By: Shalom David Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Dunne
Represented By: Shalom David Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps. 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dunne
Represented By: Shalom David Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DGVault, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Aslanian
Represented By: Laurence B Orloff
Represented By: David Gorvitz
Represented By: Julie Levinson Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?