United States of America v. Mandras et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Orange County Tax Collector, Jacqueline Mandras, George Mandras, Plantation Park Private Residences Condominium Association, Inc., Bay Hill Property Owners Association, Inc. and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 6:2020cv00164
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/23/2020 by United States of America as to Jacqueline Mandras. (Carroll, Allison)
March 25, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/23/2020 by United States of America as to George Mandras. (Carroll, Allison)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #18 United States's Motion for Clerk's Default as to Entity Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/17/2020. (JLE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2020: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - SunTrust's Withdrawal, #2 Exhibit Attachment B - Bay Hill Public Records, #3 Exhibit Attachment C- Plantation Park's Public Records) (JLE).
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Bay Hill Property Owners Association, Inc., Plantation Park Private Residences Condominium Association, Inc., SunTrust Bank by United States of America. (Carroll, Allison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
February 19, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by United States of America. (Carroll, Allison)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Orange County Tax Collector. Related case(s): Yes (Paasch, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Orange County Tax Collector. (Paasch, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint by Orange County Tax Collector.(Paasch, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 02/06/2020 by United States of America as to Plantation Park Private Residences Condominium Association, Inc.. (Carroll, Allison)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 02/06/2020 by United States of America as to SunTrust Bank. (Carroll, Allison)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 02/06/2020 by United States of America as to Orange County Tax Collector. (Carroll, Allison)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 02/10/2020 by United States of America as to Bay Hill Property Owners Association, Inc.. (Carroll, Allison)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/7/2020. (RMF)ctp
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/7/2020. (RMF)ctp
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/7/2020. (RMF)ctp
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Bay Hill Property Owners Association, Inc., George Mandras, Jacqueline Mandras, Orange County Tax Collector, Plantation Park Private Residences Condominium Association, Inc., SunTrust Bank. (BIA)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-164-Orl-78EJK. (SJB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons George Mandras, #2 Proposed Summons Jacqueline Mandras, #3 Proposed Summons SunTrust Bank, #4 Proposed Summons Bay Hill POA, #5 Proposed Summons Plantation Park COA, #6 Proposed Summons Orange County TC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Allison)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): Yes (Carroll, Allison)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Carroll, Allison)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Carroll, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mandras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Tax Collector
Represented By: Michael A. Paasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Mandras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mandras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plantation Park Private Residences Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Hill Property Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Allison C. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?