Sutton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2020cv00190
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security, SSA. (Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT for Review of a Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr.(SPM)
February 12, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Commissioner of Social Security. Answer due by 2/27/2020. (SPM)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 the Commissioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Commissioner shall file a response to the Complaint on or before February 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/12/2020. (JLE)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 27, 2020, to File Answer by Commissioner of Social Security, SSA. (Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 2/12/2020 (SPM).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON PROCEEDING PRO SE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/6/2020. (JLE)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLETION OF FORM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form for Review of SSI or SSD Claim)(JLE)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Plaintiff is directed to file his Notice of pendency of other actions within 14 days from the date of this order (Defendant filed at Doc. No. #2). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/6/2020. (copy mailed)(AKC)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-190-Orl-18EJK. (SJB)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): y (Ragler, Phillip)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2019 19323 CODL filed in State Court on 12/30/2019. filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ragler, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Antonio Sutton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?