Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC v. Hilyer, et al.
Defendant: Stephanie Michelle Hilyer and Mark Anthony Hilyer
Petitioner: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00427
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment against Mark Anthony Hilyer, Stephanie Michelle Hilyer by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mark Anthony Hilyer, Stephanie Michelle Hilyer (MEJ)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Mark Anthony Hilyer, Stephanie Michelle Hilyer by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a renewed Motion for Clerk's Default or otherwise response to the Court's Order #11 regarding the sufficiency of the service of process within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/10/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR A CLERK'S DEFAULT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/23/2020. (HMK)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Mark Anthony Hilyer, Stephanie Michelle Hilyer by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Epstein, Richard)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Epstein, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/13/2020. (HMK)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Related case(s): no (Epstein, Richard) Modified on 3/25/2020 (MEJ).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/18/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Mark Anthony Hilyer. (MEJ)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Stephanie Michelle Hilyer. (MEJ)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-427-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16575862) filed by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Epstein, Richard) Modified on 3/10/2020 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC v. Hilyer, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Michelle Hilyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Anthony Hilyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?