Roberts v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Donna Jean Roberts
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00435
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 **ENTERED IN WRONG CASE (RDO)**
March 25, 2020 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-2058, filed on 3/24/2020. (MAA)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (MAA)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (MEJ)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number MDL No. 2741, In re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 3/11/2020, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (MEJ)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-435-Orl-31LRH. (SJB)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16576329) filed by Donna Jean Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jean Roberts
Represented By: G. Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?